NY A10519 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disallows, for purposes of the unincorporated business corporation tax, the general corporation tax, the city banking tax, and the city business corporation tax, certain amendments, with respect to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021, made to the internal revenue code by sections 2303, 2304 and 2306 of public law 116-136.
Title
Disallows, for purposes of the unincorporated business corporation tax, the general corporation tax, the city banking tax, and the city business corporation tax, certain amendments, with respect to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021, made to the internal revenue code by sections 2303, 2304 and 2306 of public law 116-136.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.121 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.52 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10519 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.662 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8411 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.52 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08411 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.121