NY A10532 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the forbearance of residential and commercial investment property mortgage repayments; requires New York regulated banking organizations to make applications for forbearance for residential and commercial investment property mortgage repayments available to qualified mortgagors during the period in which the NY on PAUSE order is in effect in the county wherein the qualified mortgagor holder is located and to grant such applications for a period of 180 days.
Title
Relates to the forbearance of residential and commercial investment property mortgage repayments; requires New York regulated banking organizations to make applications for forbearance for residential and commercial investment property mortgage repayments available to qualified mortgagors during the period in which the NY on PAUSE order is in effect in the county wherein the qualified mortgagor holder is located and to grant such applications for a period of 180 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.329 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.329 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10532a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S08744 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - REFERRED TO RULES