NY A10534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that directors of controlled corporations may serve on the designated audit committee of the board of such controlling corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that directors of controlled corporations may serve on the designated audit committee of the board of such controlling corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatesigned chap.468
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2063
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8638
2018-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1056
2018-05-31Assemblyreported
2018-05-04Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08638 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10534

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback