NY A10538 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Tonawanda allowing for the designation or appointment of an inspector or inspectors of plumbing where such inspectors shall be citizens and actual residents of the county wherein the city is situated, or in an abutting or adjacent county.
Title
Relates to a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Tonawanda allowing for the designation or appointment of an inspector or inspectors of plumbing where such inspectors shall be citizens and actual residents of the county wherein the city is situated, or in an abutting or adjacent county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.279 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a10538 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.742 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8378 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.127 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08378 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.279