NY A10559 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends expiration of authority granted to the city of New York to restructure the rents of units in buildings receiving municipally financed rehabilitation loans.
Title
Extends expiration of authority granted to the city of New York to restructure the rents of units in buildings receiving municipally financed rehabilitation loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.95 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2091 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1059 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08529 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - REFERRED TO CITIES