NY A10561 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of chapter 375 of the laws of 1999 relating to the management of buildings for which administrators have been appointed.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of chapter 375 of the laws of 1999 relating to the management of buildings for which administrators have been appointed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.97 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2089 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1061 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08527 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - REFERRED TO CITIES