NY A10566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner to collect information regarding the sheltered and unsheltered homeless population during a state disaster emergency and publish a report containing such information on the department's website.
Title
Requires the commissioner to collect information regarding the sheltered and unsheltered homeless population during a state disaster emergency and publish a report containing such information on the department's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.37 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.331 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.866 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8643A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.272 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.272 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 10566a |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S08643 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.37