NY A10581 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes former foster care youth who have been discharged from foster care to return to foster care placement during the COVID-19 state of emergency without requiring such children to file a motion authorizing their return to foster care placement and places a temporary moratorium on aging out of foster care during a state of emergency.
Title
Authorizes former foster care youth who have been discharged from foster care to return to foster care placement during the COVID-19 state of emergency without requiring such children to file a motion authorizing their return to foster care placement and places a temporary moratorium on aging out of foster care during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.50 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.346 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10581b |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1032 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8834 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.295 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10581b |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10581a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08470 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S08834 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.50
S08834 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.50