NY A10590 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the Nanticoke Creek to the definition of inland waterways as a major creek.
Title
Adds the Nanticoke Creek to the definition of inland waterways as a major creek.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8283 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.367 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.367 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08283 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.502