NY A10605 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of authority granted to the city of New York to restructure rent for units in multiple dwellings getting small loans to remove substandard or insanitary conditions.
Title
Extends the expiration of authority granted to the city of New York to restructure rent for units in multiple dwellings getting small loans to remove substandard or insanitary conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.98 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2092 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1065 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08530 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - REFERRED TO CITIES