NY A10613 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excess medical malpractice insurance and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to excess medical malpractice insurance and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.99 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1390 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8499 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1068 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08499 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10613