NY A10625 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Village of Patchogue to file an application for a real property tax exemption for certain parcels.
Title
Permits the Village of Patchogue to file an application for a real property tax exemption for certain parcels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.166 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10625a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1006 |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8793 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.334 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10625a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07901 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - referred to real property taxation
S08793 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.166
S08793 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.166