NY A10634 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7746a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7746a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.
Title
Extends authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s7746a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.125 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.125 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07746 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.438