NY A10639 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8380a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8380a
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.283
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.283
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-13Assemblyprint number 10639a
2018-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-10Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S08380 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.372

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10639
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10639A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback