NY A10656 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s8414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s8414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the New York Academy of Medicine.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the New York Academy of Medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s8414 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.65 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08414 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.447