NY A10670 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that all increased payments for salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments during a wage freeze be suspended; makes such provisions applicable to county employees and employees of covered organizations, whether or not they are covered by a collectively negotiated agreement; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that all increased payments for salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments during a wage freeze be suspended; makes such provisions applicable to county employees and employees of covered organizations, whether or not they are covered by a collectively negotiated agreement; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8805
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.414
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.414
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-10Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08805 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.5

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback