NY A10673 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits to purchase online groceries in accordance with federal laws and regulations and relates to the state supplemental nutrition assistance program outreach program.
Title
Authorizes the use of supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits to purchase online groceries in accordance with federal laws and regulations and relates to the state supplemental nutrition assistance program outreach program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.46 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.342 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.276 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10673 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.989 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8247A |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-04-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8247a |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.276 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.276 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S08247 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.46