NY A10676 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rate of interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to the New York city employees' retirement system, the New York city teachers' retirement system, the police pension fund, the fire department pension fund and the board of education retirement system of such city by public employers and other obligors required to make employer contributions to such retirement systems, the crediting of special interest and additional interest to members of such retirement systems, and the allowance of supplementary interest on the funds of such retirement systems.
Title
Relates to the rate of interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to the New York city employees' retirement system, the New York city teachers' retirement system, the police pension fund, the fire department pension fund and the board of education retirement system of such city by public employers and other obligors required to make employer contributions to such retirement systems, the crediting of special interest and additional interest to members of such retirement systems, and the allowance of supplementary interest on the funds of such retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.100 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1443 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8557A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1071 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08557 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10676