NY A10685 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the determination of a quorum for the transaction of business of the New York convention center operating corporation.
Title
Relates to the determination of a quorum for the transaction of business of the New York convention center operating corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.171 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1966 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8579 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1073 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08579 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10685