NY A10697 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Instructs the office of temporary and disability assistance to apply for a waiver from the federal government to allow for the purchase of multivitamin-mineral dietary supplements with benefits through SNAP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructs the office of temporary and disability assistance to apply for a waiver from the federal government to allow for the purchase of multivitamin-mineral dietary supplements with benefits through SNAP.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatetabled
2018-12-21Senatevetoed memo.305
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2134
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S9008
2018-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1074
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-05-10Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S08453 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10697
S09008 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10697

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback