NY A10703 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Firefighter/EMT Michael J. Field Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Firefighter/EMT Michael J. Field Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.199 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10703a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.935 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8637A |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8637a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | print number 10703a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08637 (Same As) 2020-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.199