NY A10706 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.970 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |