NY A10717 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retroactive tier III membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Steven R. Grice.
Title
Authorizes retroactive tier III membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Steven R. Grice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8598 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.457 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08598 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.373