NY A10743 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that receipt of the temporary emergency increase in unemployment compensation benefits as provided for by the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Sec. 9023) shall not affect benefit eligibility for certain public assistance benefits.
Title
Provides that receipt of the temporary emergency increase in unemployment compensation benefits as provided for by the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Sec. 9023) shall not affect benefit eligibility for certain public assistance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.279 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.279 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S08739 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means