NY A10744 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an additional certification classification for minority and women-owned businesses which are ineligible for certification due to exceeding the personal net worth of small business thresholds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an additional certification classification for minority and women-owned businesses which are ineligible for certification due to exceeding the personal net worth of small business thresholds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.345
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2069
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8870A
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyamended on third reading 10744a
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.127
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.127
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08870 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10744A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10744
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10744A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10744&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10744#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback