NY A10756 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance regional juvenile detention facilities.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance regional juvenile detention facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.173 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2067 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8808A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.419 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.419 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 10756a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08808 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10756A