NY A10768 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the empire state commercial production tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the empire state commercial production tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senateapproval memo.20
2018-12-28Senatesigned chap.518
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.2008
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8465
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.194
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.194
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08465 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10768

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10768&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10768&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10768
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10768&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10768&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10768#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10768&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback