NY A10774 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.414
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the radon task force to conduct a comprehensive study on the prevention of human exposure to radon and make recommendations to reduce and minimize exposure to New York state residents; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the radon task force to conduct a comprehensive study on the prevention of human exposure to radon and make recommendations to reduce and minimize exposure to New York state residents; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.414
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2068
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8845A
2018-06-18SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblyrepassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 10774a
2018-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2018-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2018-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.128
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.128
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-17Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08845 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10774A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10774
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10774A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10774&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10774#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback