NY A10799 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends an occupancy tax in the village of Mount Kisco.
Title
Extends an occupancy tax in the village of Mount Kisco.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8915 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08915 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.511