NY A10807 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requests for absentee ballots; when they may be received.
Title
Relates to requests for absentee ballots; when they may be received.
Sponsors
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | signed chap.138 |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.964 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8783A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.219 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.219 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08783 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138