NY A10808 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the receipt by the board of elections of certain absentee ballots received by a board of elections that do not bear or display a dated postmark.
Title
Relates to the receipt by the board of elections of certain absentee ballots received by a board of elections that do not bear or display a dated postmark.
Sponsors
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.140 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10808a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.969 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8799A |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8799a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.345 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | print number 10808a |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08799 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.140