NY A10813 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the Terence Cardinal Cooke health care center, in relation to extending the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the powers of the Terence Cardinal Cooke health care center, in relation to extending the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.174 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1973 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8822 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.69 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.69 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08822 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10813