NY A10816 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Spring Valley justices to live in the towns of Ramapo or Clarkstown, county of Rockland.
Title
Authorizes the village of Spring Valley justices to live in the towns of Ramapo or Clarkstown, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.254 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1995 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9082 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1080 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10816a |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09082 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10816A