NY A10830 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of chapter 563 of the laws of 2001 relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification demonstration program.
Title
Extends the provisions of chapter 563 of the laws of 2001 relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification demonstration program.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.102 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1501 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8158A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1081 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08158 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10830