NY A10832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public employers to adopt a plan for operations in the event of a declared public health emergency involving a communicable disease which shall include identification of essential personnel, needed personal protective equipment, staggering work shifts and providing necessary technology for telecommuting.
Title
Requires public employers to adopt a plan for operations in the event of a declared public health emergency involving a communicable disease which shall include identification of essential personnel, needed personal protective equipment, staggering work shifts and providing necessary technology for telecommuting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-07 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.7 |
2020-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.168 |
2020-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10832 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.930 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8617B |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8617A |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8617b |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.349 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08617 (Same As) 2020-09-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.7