NY A10833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes absentee voting; defines the term "illness" for the purposes of absentee voting to include instances where a voter is unable to appear personally at the polling place of the election district in which they are a qualified voter because there is a risk of contracting or spreading a disease causing illness to the voter or to other members of the public.
Title
Authorizes absentee voting; defines the term "illness" for the purposes of absentee voting to include instances where a voter is unable to appear personally at the polling place of the election district in which they are a qualified voter because there is a risk of contracting or spreading a disease causing illness to the voter or to other members of the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.4 |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.139 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.350 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10833 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.894 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8015D |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8015C |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8015B |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8015A |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8015d |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.350 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.350 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08015 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.4