NY A10858 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s8101 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1085 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08101 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.445