NY A10860 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s8103 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1087 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08103 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.446