NY A10918 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8249a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts Nedrow Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts Nedrow Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8249a
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.379
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.379
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-29Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S08249 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.500

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback