NY A10951 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that 85% of proceeds from the sale of any property that was previously used, operated or maintained by the office for people with developmental disabilities shall be used exclusively for state-operated residential services or state-operated community-based services provided by such office.
Title
Requires that 85% of proceeds from the sale of any property that was previously used, operated or maintained by the office for people with developmental disabilities shall be used exclusively for state-operated residential services or state-operated community-based services provided by such office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8633 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.490 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S08633 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.374