NY A10956 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of St. Johnsville to hire a village clerk/treasurer and code enforcement officer who is not a resident of such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of St. Johnsville to hire a village clerk/treasurer and code enforcement officer who is not a resident of such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8819 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.383 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.383 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08819 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.352