NY A10971 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to federal bond volume allocations, the unified state bond ceiling and the private activity bond allocation act of 2018.
Title
Relates to federal bond volume allocations, the unified state bond ceiling and the private activity bond allocation act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.103 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2128 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8847A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | print number 10971a |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08847 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10971A