NY A10999 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nassau county civil divisions act relating to the purposes of the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of East Meadow.
Title
Amends the Nassau county civil divisions act relating to the purposes of the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of East Meadow.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8829 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.425 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08829 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.353