NY A11005 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey certain unused state lands to MCB-Eagle New Paltz, LLC upon the consent of the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation, in consideration of fair market value and upon such other terms and conditions.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey certain unused state lands to MCB-Eagle New Paltz, LLC upon the consent of the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation, in consideration of fair market value and upon such other terms and conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8338 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.387 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08338 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.350