NY A11017 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any funds paid to a support collection unit which have not been disbursed after two years after diligent efforts to locate the person entitled to such funds, and funds which the remitter of such funds has not provided sufficient identifying information to associate the funds with an existing account shall be paid to the state comptroller.
Title
Provides that any funds paid to a support collection unit which have not been disbursed after two years after diligent efforts to locate the person entitled to such funds, and funds which the remitter of such funds has not provided sufficient identifying information to associate the funds with an existing account shall be paid to the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.476 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.476 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 11017a |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08994 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - PRINT NUMBER 8994A