NY A11026 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings; extends effectiveness.
Title
Relates to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings; extends effectiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.257 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1884 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8653 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.80 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.80 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08653 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11026