NY A11037 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8187a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state university of New York to enter into a lease and otherwise contract to make grounds available and facilities of the state university of New York at Stony Brook to the Ronald McDonald House of Long Island, Inc., a not-for-profit corporation, to ensure quality pediatric health care services to the surrounding community; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state university of New York to enter into a lease and otherwise contract to make grounds available and facilities of the state university of New York at Stony Brook to the Ronald McDonald House of Long Island, Inc., a not-for-profit corporation, to ensure quality pediatric health care services to the surrounding community; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8187a
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.390
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.390
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-31Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S08187 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.498

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback