NY A11047 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 11047a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 11047a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Continues NYS Smart Scholars early college high school program and the NYS pathways in technology early college high school program.
Title
Continues NYS Smart Scholars early college high school program and the NYS pathways in technology early college high school program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 11047a |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08700 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S09060 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means
S09060 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means