NY A11050 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the long-term care ombudsman program.
Title
Relates to the long-term care ombudsman program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.259 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1903 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9002 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.209 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.209 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S09002 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11050