NY A11113 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8560a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8560a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the production and sale of mead and braggot.
Title
Relates to the production and sale of mead and braggot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8560a |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.465 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08560 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.24